Dual Drivers Register as at 17:47 on 19 September 2024
Licence Number | Applicant Name | Issued | Commences | Expires |
---|---|---|---|---|
DD3430 | WONG Yuen Tung | 18/09/2024 | 20/09/2024 | 19/09/2027 |
DD3431 | SHEIKH MUHAMMAD AKHTAR Younis | 18/09/2024 | 20/09/2024 | 19/09/2027 |
DD3432 | CHENG Wing Hong | 18/09/2024 | 20/09/2024 | 19/09/2027 |
DD3433 | ELTOWM Rajab Elabeid | 18/09/2024 | 20/09/2024 | 19/09/2027 |
DD3434 | MEHMOOD Tariq | 18/09/2024 | 20/09/2024 | 23/11/2026 |
DD3435 | CHAN Wing Cheong | 18/09/2024 | 20/09/2024 | 19/09/2027 |
DD3436 | LATIF Ismaeel Khan | 18/09/2024 | 20/09/2024 | 19/09/2027 |
DD3437 | RIAZ Usman Zaib | 18/09/2024 | 20/09/2024 | 19/09/2027 |
DD3438 | AKRAM Waqar | 18/09/2024 | 20/09/2024 | 19/09/2027 |
DD3439 | JOSEPH Victor Ogbeide Moses | 18/09/2024 | 19/09/2024 | 26/10/2026 |