Dual Drivers Register as at 17:23 on 19 September 2024
Licence Number | Applicant Name | Issued | Commences | Expires |
---|---|---|---|---|
DD3435 | CHAN Wing Cheong | 18/09/2024 | 20/09/2024 | 19/09/2027 |
DD3436 | LATIF Ismaeel Khan | 18/09/2024 | 20/09/2024 | 19/09/2027 |
DD3437 | RIAZ Usman Zaib | 18/09/2024 | 20/09/2024 | 19/09/2027 |
DD3438 | AKRAM Waqar | 18/09/2024 | 20/09/2024 | 19/09/2027 |
DD3439 | JOSEPH Victor Ogbeide Moses | 18/09/2024 | 19/09/2024 | 26/10/2026 |
DD3440 | KHAN Soban Abdul Rakman | 18/09/2024 | 20/09/2024 | 19/09/2027 |
DD3441 | SHAH Syed Sajjad Haider | 18/09/2024 | 20/09/2024 | 19/09/2027 |
DD3442 | MOHAMMAD Shakeel | 18/09/2024 | 20/09/2024 | 19/09/2027 |
DD3443 | ALI Shouket | 18/09/2024 | 20/09/2024 | 19/09/2027 |
DD3444 | HANIF Rizwan | 19/09/2024 | 20/09/2024 | 23/11/2024 |